Global Patent Index - EP 0741019 B1

EP 0741019 B1 2000-06-28 - Individually driven folding apparatus for a rotary printing machine

Title (en)

Individually driven folding apparatus for a rotary printing machine

Title (de)

Einzeln angetriebener Falzapparat für eine Rotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Appareil de pliage entraîné individuellement pour une machine d'impression rotative

Publication

EP 0741019 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810253 A

Priority

DE 19516443 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0741019A2] The folder is driven by its own drive motor (10) which is coupled mechanically only to the folder. The mechanical coupling is provided by a drive pinion (10.1) on the motor side and by a spur wheel on the cylinder side. The drive can act on the folding flap cylinder or on the cutter cylinder or on the collecting cylinder. The drive motor can drive through a toothed belt any gear wheel in the entire drive train between cutter cylinder and delivery. The drive can also take place on an intermediate wheel in active connection with the drive train with a one-step translation ratio between drive motor and gearwheel. The individual drive allows the folder to turn to any position independently of the position of the printing mechanism.

IPC 1-7

B41F 13/60; B41F 13/00; B41F 13/008

IPC 8 full level

B41F 13/004 (2006.01); B41F 13/60 (2006.01); B65H 45/16 (2006.01); B65H 45/22 (2006.01)

CPC

B65H 45/16 (2013.01); B41F 13/0045 (2013.01); B41F 13/60 (2013.01); B65H 45/225 (2013.01); B41P 2213/126 (2013.01); B41P 2213/734 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • BORIS FUCHS: "Color-Management-Systeme, Computer-to-plate ...", DEUTSCHE DRUCKER, no. 14, 13 April 1995 (1995-04-13), pages W46 - W53
  • BORIS FUCHS: "Rotationsmaschinenantrieb ohne Längswelle - eine Wiederentdeckung von Hamada", ZEITUNGSTECHNIK, 1 December 1991 (1991-12-01), pages 78 - 80

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

DOCDB simple family

EP 0741019 A2 19961106; EP 0741019 A3 19971001; EP 0741019 B1 20000628; EP 0741019 B2 20030423; DE 19516443 A1 19961107; ES 2149442 T3 20001101; ES 2149442 T5 20031101; US 5775222 A 19980707; US 5775222 C1 20011127