Global Patent Index - EP 0741020 B1

EP 0741020 B1 2000-06-28 - Rotary printing machine having a free mountable folding apparatus

Title (en)

Rotary printing machine having a free mountable folding apparatus

Title (de)

Rotationsdruckmaschine mit frei aufstellbarem Falzapparat

Title (fr)

Machine d'impression rotative comprenant un appareil de pliage à assemblage libre

Publication

EP 0741020 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810254 A

Priority

DE 19516445 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0741020A2] A rotary printing machine (D1 to D6) and its associated sheet-folders (F1, F2, F3) is capable of a variety of configurations depending on spatial constraints and the location of a particular delivery point for finished work. The folding/handling mechanisms each comprise the necessary paper guides, traction rollers, assembly/shearing cylinder, independently driven folding cylinder and final delivery table which may be fed by a vane-wheel or conveyor track. Individual settings and adjustments at all stages of handling subsequent to printing are readily carried out under conditions of maximum flexibility of equipment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/60; B41F 13/00; B41F 13/008; B41F 13/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/008 (2006.01); B41F 13/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/225 (2013.01); B41F 13/0008 (2013.01); B41F 13/008 (2013.01); B41F 13/60 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • DIPL.-ING. BORIS FUCHS: "Color-Management-Systeme, Computer-to-plate und wellenlos angetriebene Achtertürme ...", DEUTSCHER DRUCKER, vol. 14-15, 13 April 1995 (1995-04-13), pages W46 - W53
  • BORIS FUCHS: "Rotationsmaschinenantrieb ohne Längswelle - eine Wiederentdeckung von Hamada", ZEITUNGSTECHNIK, 31 December 1991 (1991-12-31), pages 78 - 80

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0741020 A2 19961106; EP 0741020 A3 19971001; EP 0741020 B1 20000628; EP 0741020 B2 20051116; DE 19516445 A1 19961107; ES 2150654 T3 20001201; US 5676056 A 19971014; US 5676056 B1 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-04-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605480

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150402

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100419

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100419

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070419

2008-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060420

2008-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060419

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK *WIFAG

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-06-16 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2006-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-01 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2006-02-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060227

2006-01-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-12-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2005-11-16 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2005-04-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050422

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-21 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050418

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT -LIZENZEN-PATENT

2005-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

2005-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

2005-01-12 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT -LIZENZEN-PA

- Effective date: 20010327

2005-01-12 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20010328

2005-01-12 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20010328

2005-01-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT -LIZENZEN-PA

- Effective date: 20010327

2005-01-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20010328

2005-01-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20010328

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT -LIZENZEN-PATENT

2001-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

2001-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

2001-05-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT -LIZENZEN-PATENT

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-05-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT -LIZENZEN-PATENT

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-05-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-05-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150654 T3

2000-09-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605480 20000803

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-06-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

1998-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980708

1998-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980303

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE