Global patent index - EP 0741026 B1

EP 0741026 B1 2001-02-21 - Image inspection and ink supply method in printed products of a printing machine

Title (en)

Image inspection and ink supply method in printed products of a printing machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bildinspektion und Farbführung an Druckprodukten einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé d'inspection d'images et d'alimentation en encre dans des produits imprimés d'une machine d'impression

Publication

EP 0741026 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96105187 A

Priority

DE 19516354 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0741026A2] An automated process is used in which the image data obtained from camera scanning of the printed output of a printing process is fed to a computer system for comparison with a set of reference data. The difference data is processed and the location of the fault on the printed sheet is indicated on a display screen. There are a large number of printing faults that can be due to a large number of different factors. The relationship between the faults and the factors causing them are defined within an information matrix and this is used for rapid fault identification analysis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0741026 A2 19961106; EP 0741026 A3 19980325; EP 0741026 B1 20010221; DE 19516354 A1 19961107; US 6373964 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59606450

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140423

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061230

2005-04-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050419

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606450

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-29

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010221

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981116

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960401

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB