Global Patent Index - EP 0741027 B1

EP 0741027 B1 2000-07-12 - Image inspection apparatus

Title (en)

Image inspection apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Bildinspektion

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'inspection d'images

Publication

EP 0741027 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96105188 A

Priority

DE 19516352 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0741027A2] A camera is used to monitor the output of a printing machine and the data is fed to a comparator (1) and to a counter (2). The comparator also receives image reference data from a memory (3) and difference data (4) is received by a threshold limit stage (5) and a difference image circuit (6). When the difference data exceeds the set limit an output (8) is produced that is applied to a gating circuit (14) that combined with XY counter stage outputs to address a memory (15). This provides control of scanning of the image and the position of the fault in an inspection window (13) is indicated on a monitor screen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0036 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0741027 A2 19961106; EP 0741027 A3 19980325; EP 0741027 B1 20000712; DE 19516352 A1 19961107; US 6449385 B1 20020910

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605570

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140423

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-03-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605570 20000817

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981116

1998-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960401

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB