Global Patent Index - EP 0741036 B1

EP 0741036 B1 2001-01-24 - Mounting mechanisms for cloth rolls on press cylinder cleaning devices

Title (en)

Mounting mechanisms for cloth rolls on press cylinder cleaning devices

Title (de)

Montagemechanismus für Textilrollen für Walzenwaschvorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de montage pour les rouleaux de matière textile pour dispositifs de nettoyage d'un cylindre

Publication

EP 0741036 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96301078 A

Priority

US 43185895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0741036A2] A cleaning material supply system for a printing press having a supply core disposed around a supply shaft, the supply core having an internal polygonal cross-sectional shape corresponding to an outer shape of the supply shaft to couple the shaft and core together so as to prevent relative rotation between the supply core and the supply shaft. The cleaning system for a cylinder of a printing press may also include a supply core having a key receiver dimensioned to receive a key to couple the supply core to a supply shaft to prevent relative rotation between the supply core and the supply shaft. A slot receiving arrangement for the take-up shaft having a movable finger and the receiving slot is also depicted. In addition, a take-up shaft having an external polygonal cross-sectional shape is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/02 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01); B41F 35/06 (2006.01); B65H 75/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/242 (2013.01); B41F 35/00 (2013.01); B41P 2235/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0741036 A2 19961106; EP 0741036 A3 19970416; EP 0741036 B1 20010124; CN 1084678 C 20020515; CN 1140659 A 19970122; DE 69611631 D1 20010301; DE 69611631 T2 20010802; JP H08300633 A 19961119

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100216

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100216

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100216

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-02-22 [REG GB 728Y] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION ALLOWED (SECT. 28/1977)

2005-10-07 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2005-07-06 [REG GB 728V] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION FILED (SECT. 28/1977)

2005-04-08 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040216

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611631 20010301

2001-02-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981030

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970918

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT