Global Patent Index - EP 0741040 B1

EP 0741040 B1 2000-01-19 - Ink mist collector with porous bottom

Title (en)

Ink mist collector with porous bottom

Title (de)

Tintennebelsammler mit porösem Boden

Title (fr)

Collecteur de brouillard d'encre avec un fond poreux

Publication

EP 0741040 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96303081 A

Priority

US 43399995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0741040A2] An ink mist collector assembly collects ink mist formed on a printhead of an ink jet printing system. The ink mist collector assembly comprises a magnetic material, and a porous material attached to the magnetic material to create a porous magnetic unit. The ink mist collector assembly further comprises means for engaging the porous magnetic unit to the printhead, to collect ink mist formed on the printhead. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/185

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17 (2006.01); B41J 2/185 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1714 (2013.01); B41J 2/185 (2013.01); B41J 2002/1853 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0741040 A2 19961106; EP 0741040 A3 19980204; EP 0741040 B1 20000119; CA 2175726 A1 19961105; DE 69606217 D1 20000224; DE 69606217 T2 20000907

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060406

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-10-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-04-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606217 20000224

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990427

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961125

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB