Global Patent Index - EP 0741097 B1

EP 0741097 B1 2001-12-19 - Device for finishing the fold of signatures

Title (en)

Device for finishing the fold of signatures

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Endbearbeitung des Falzes von Signaturen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de finition du pli de livrets

Publication

EP 0741097 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96107126 A

Priority

DE 29507466 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0741097A2] The booklet folder consists of at least one pair of parallel and opposite rollers (12). The rollers have a gap between them for the booklets (14) to pass through. At least one (12b) of the rollers is driven. Rollers (12a,b) are spring-loaded towards one another. A perpendicular to a line joining the axes of the two rollers is inclined in relation to the booklets' direction of travel. The booklets are guided between the rollers by a deflector (20) in the form of an endless belt, so that the folded edges of the booklets are turned before they pass between the rollers to give more reliable creasing. The rollers can be set in two pairs (10a,b,12a,b), one behind the other, with the upper rollers spring-loaded and the endless belt passing round the lower ones, which are driven by a single motor (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/12; B65H 45/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/12 (2013.01); B65H 2404/261 (2013.01); B65H 2701/18271 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29507466 U1 19950706; EP 0741097 A2 19961106; EP 0741097 A3 19970305; EP 0741097 B1 20011219; EP 0741097 B9 20021002

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69618066

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69618066

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100705

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070506

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070506

2006-05-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060503

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020322

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69618066 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990412

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970804

1997-04-30 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-02-05 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB