Global Patent Index - EP 0741222 B1

EP 0741222 B1 2000-02-23 - Adjustable door hinge

Title (en)

Adjustable door hinge

Title (de)

Verstellbares Türband

Title (fr)

Charnière de porte réglable

Publication

EP 0741222 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96106861 A

Priority

DE 19516159 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0741222A1] The second holder element (4) contains an axial threaded hole (125) into which is screwed a fastening element (131) for fixing the fixture element (124). The fastening element fits into a V-shaped groove (145) in the fixture element, and has a conical, pin shaped protuberance (135) matching the shape of the groove into which it fits. The radial hole (129) in the door-frame side holder element (4) has a larger-diameter part (137) and an adjacent smaller diameter (139) part. The bolt element (6) joining the two holder elements (2,4) has a third part of the same or larger diameter between the first (30) and second (34) end section and containing holes (42).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/00; E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/00 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01); E05D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0027 (2013.01); E05D 7/043 (2013.01); E05D 5/02 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/32 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/322 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/51 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/61 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/622 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/26 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0741222 A1 19961106; EP 0741222 B1 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2002-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-12-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-05-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-05-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000523

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-05-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-05-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000519

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-05-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000518

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT SE

1999-05-06 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: DEPKE, HARTMUT

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990216

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970605

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT SE