Global Patent Index - EP 0741273 B1

EP 0741273 B1 2002-11-20 - A plate-type heat exchanger

Title (en)

A plate-type heat exchanger

Title (de)

Plattenwärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur à plaques

Publication

EP 0741273 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96105996 A

Priority

IT MI950882 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0741273A2] Each couple of plates (1) defines a first canal (3) for a fluid under pressure by means of welded ribbing (2) that distance and reinforce the plates (1) and are parallel to the flow of said fluid and bears a continuous fin with a wave shape (4) perpendicular to the direction of said fluid, welded on each of its external surfaces, to define a second canal (5) for a second fluid associated to an opposite and equal fin (4) borne on a plate (1) of an adjacent couple, each couple of plates being free from the others and hence that can be singly extracted from the exchanger. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 9/00; F28F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/02 (2006.01); F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28D 15/02 (2006.01); F28F 3/00 (2006.01); F28F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 15/0241 (2013.01); F28D 9/0031 (2013.01); F28F 3/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0741273 A2 19961106; EP 0741273 A3 19971001; EP 0741273 B1 20021120; AT 228232 T 20021215; CA 2175538 A1 19961104; CZ 9601277 A3 19961113; DE 69624864 D1 20030102; IT 1279041 B1 19971204; IT MI950882 A1 19961104; IT MI950882 D0 19950503

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-04-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-02-21 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030221

2003-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69624864 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB LU NL SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228232 T 20021215

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000814

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980324

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB LU NL SE

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB LU NL SE