Global patent index - EP 0741375 A3

EP 0741375 A3 2000-01-05 - Closed loop transaction based mail accounting and payment system with carrier payment through a third party initiated by mailing information release

Title (en)

Closed loop transaction based mail accounting and payment system with carrier payment through a third party initiated by mailing information release

Title (de)

Auf Transaktionen mit geschlossener Schleife basierendes Rechnungs- und Bezahlungssystem für Postsendungen mit durch Freigabe der Postversandinformation ausgelöster Bezahlung des Beförderers durch eine dritte Partei

Title (fr)

Système de facturation et de paiement du courrier basé sur la transmission en boucle fermée avec paiement du transporteur par un tiers déclenché par la libération de l'information d'envoi postal

Publication

EP 0741375 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96106907 A

Priority

  • US 62971996 A
  • US 43273395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0741375A2] A method for mail accounting and payment includes creating a mail batch including a plurality of mailpieces and creating a statement of mailing (1014) containing data relating to the mail batch (1016). The statement of mailing is digitally signed to facilitate a subsequent verification of the integrity of the data in the statement of mailing. The digital signature is included as part of the statement of mailing. The statement of mailing is submitted to a transaction processing center (1008). The transaction processing center (1008) initiates a funds transfer to a carrier delivery service for carrier delivery services (1010) payment for the batch of mail (1016). The statement of mailing or other mailing data may be stored in a nonvolatile memory means. The nonvolatile memory means allows the statement of mailing (1014) to be stored therein and erased therefrom but not modified. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07G 1/12 (2006.01); B65G 61/00 (2006.01); G06Q 10/00 (2006.01); G06Q 20/00 (2006.01); G06Q 40/00 (2006.01); G06Q 50/00 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 17/00467 (2013.01); G07B 17/00508 (2013.01); G07B 17/00661 (2013.01); G07B 17/00733 (2013.01); G07B 17/00024 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00161 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00169 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00201 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00338 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0037 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00395 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00483 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00588 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0062 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00645 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00701 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0075 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00766 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00967 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0741375 A2 19961106; EP 0741375 A3 20000105; EP 0741375 B1 20060719; EP 0741375 B2 20090902; CA 2175406 A1 19961103; CA 2175406 C 20020409; DE 69636360 D1 20060831; DE 69636360 T2 20070712; DE 69636360 T3 20100401; JP 3965217 B2 20070829; JP H09106424 A 19970422

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150502

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150502

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150502

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69636360

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69636360

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140529

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-09-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090902

2009-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-05-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG, ABTEILUNG CT IP I&S

- Effective date: 20070418

2007-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69636360

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20060831

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: PITNEY BOWES INC.

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050323

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB