Global Patent Index - EP 0741808 B1

EP 0741808 B1 2000-07-12 - CONTROLLABLE OUTPUT BRAKE, THREAD FEED DEVICE AS WELL AS PROJECTILE OR GRIPPER WEAVING MACHINE

Title (en)

CONTROLLABLE OUTPUT BRAKE, THREAD FEED DEVICE AS WELL AS PROJECTILE OR GRIPPER WEAVING MACHINE

Title (de)

STEUERBARE AUSLAUFBREMSE, FADENLIEFERVORRICHTUNG SOWIE PROJEKTIL- ODER GREIFERWEBMASCHINE

Title (fr)

FREIN DE FIL, SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN FIL ET METIER A TISSER A NAVETTES A PINCE OU A PROJECTILE

Publication

EP 0741808 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95907619 A

Priority

  • EP 9500284 W
  • SE 9400248 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5778943A] PCT No. PCT/EP95/00284 Sec. 371 Date Jul. 25, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Jul. 25, 1996 PCT Filed Jan. 26, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO95/20700 PCT Pub. Date Aug. 3, 1995A controllable output brake for a thread feed device includes actuating elements that are connected to a control member and are used for effecting a controlled displacement of a thread brake element. The controlled displacement is an axial play with which a supporting ring for the thread brake element is supported in a holding member. The controlled displacement is used for controlling the tension of a thread. In the case of such a thread feed device, a push drive connected to the holding member is provided for each direction of movement in which the thread brake element is adjusted. The push drive for at least one direction of movement is a pneumatic push drive connected to a pneumatic drive control unit. In a projectile weaving machine, the controlled output brake is disengaged and re-engaged approximately in synchronism with a controlled thread brake which is provided as well. The engagement is preferably carried out in advance of the engagement of the controlled thread brake. In a gripper weaving machine, the controlled output brake is disengaged and re-engaged several times during each picking operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; B65H 59/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); B65H 51/30 (2006.01); B65H 59/20 (2006.01); B65H 59/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/366 (2013.01); D03D 47/365 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5778943 A 19980714; CN 1040676 C 19981111; CN 1139963 A 19970108; CZ 288320 B6 20010516; CZ 9602183 A3 19970115; DE 59508564 D1 20000817; EP 0741808 A1 19961113; EP 0741808 B1 20000712; ES 2149967 T3 20001116; JP H09508182 A 19970819; KR 100371989 B1 20030319; RU 2135657 C1 19990827; SE 9400248 D0 19940126; WO 9520700 A2 19950803; WO 9520700 A3 19950914

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130126

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080115

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IRO A.B.

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-01-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-09-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020126

2002-08-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-01-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020127

2002-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020126

2002-01-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020125

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020125

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001229

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149967 T3

2000-10-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-09-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508564 20000817

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CONTROLLABLE OUTPUT BRAKE, THREAD FEED DEVICE AS WELL AS PROJECTILE OR GRIPPER WEAVING MACHINE

1997-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970801

1996-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960710

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE