Global Patent Index - EP 0741826 B1

EP 0741826 B1 2001-04-25 - INSULATING MAT COMPRISING A MINERAL FIBRE LAYER

Title (en)

INSULATING MAT COMPRISING A MINERAL FIBRE LAYER

Title (de)

ISOLIERMATTE MIT EINER LAGE MINERALFASERN

Title (fr)

MAT ISOLANT COMPORTANT UNE COUCHE DE FIBRES MINERALES

Publication

EP 0741826 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95906905 A

Priority

  • DK 9500033 W
  • DK 12794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9520707A1] A rectangular insulating mat comprising a mineral fibre layer made from a single unit of mineral fibre material, wherein the mineral fibres are bonded together by a binder and in which mineral fibre layer the fibres are predominantly located in planes substantially perpendicular to the plane of the mat, said mat being more easily compressible in the longitudinal or transverse direction than in the transverse or longitudinal direction, respectively, which mat further comprises an air permeable covering which covers at least the predominant part of the two main surfaces of the mat and which is attached to the mat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 13/00 (2006.01); E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04B 1/78 (2006.01); E04C 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/001 (2013.01); D04H 1/4209 (2013.01); D04H 1/593 (2013.01); E04B 1/7662 (2013.01); E04B 1/78 (2013.01); E04B 9/045 (2013.01); E04C 2/16 (2013.01); E04B 2001/7683 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

WO 9302259 A1 19930204 - ROCKWOOL INT [DK]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9520707 A1 19950803; AT 200812 T 20010515; AU 1532395 A 19950815; CZ 292903 B6 20040114; CZ 9602094 A3 19970312; DE 69520784 D1 20010531; DE 69520784 T2 20010809; EP 0741826 A1 19961113; EP 0741826 B1 20010425; HU 9602049 D0 19960930; HU T75222 A 19970428; PL 315656 A1 19961125; SK 284382 B6 20050204; SK 97496 A3 19970507

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150123

2015-02-18 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150123

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090124

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100124

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Free text: BO 01/38 PAGES: 263, IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI

2002-01-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-09-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-07-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-07-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520784 20010531

2001-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-04-25 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-25 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-25 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200812 T 20010515

1998-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971216

1996-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960826

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL