Global Patent Index - EP 0741919 B1

EP 0741919 B1 2000-09-20 - CONNECTOR FOR ELECTRIC WIRES

Title (en)

CONNECTOR FOR ELECTRIC WIRES

Title (de)

VERBINDER FÜR ELEKTRISCHE KABEL

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR POUR FILS ELECTRIQUES

Publication

EP 0741919 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94923953 A

Priority

  • KR 930013448 A
  • KR 19940008370 A
  • US 9408020 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9502906A1] A connector (9) for electrically connecting a cable (10) including a bundle of electric wires (13) to a printed circuit board where the connector includes a connector body (1), a housing (12) formed to support wires of the cable integrally with one another and capable of being coupled to the connector body. The connector body includes at least one pair of facing supports (4) provided at edges of the connector body and adapted to support the housing so as to prevent the cable from being easily separated from the connector body when external force or tension is applied where at least one support of the connector body has a hook (5) adapted to engage with an edge of the housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/24; H01R 12/38; H01R 13/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 12/04 (2006.01); H01R 12/08 (2006.01); H01R 12/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6271 (2013.01); H01R 12/79 (2013.01); H01R 4/4818 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9502906 A1 19950126; DE 69425983 D1 20001026; DE 69425983 T2 20010215; EP 0741919 A1 19961113; EP 0741919 A4 19960919; EP 0741919 B1 20000920; JP H09503612 A 19970408; SG 48995 A1 19980518

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030718

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-07-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030718

2002-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020702

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-06-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020613

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425983 20001026

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 12/24 A, 7H 01R 12/38 B, 7H 01R 13/627 B

1998-08-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V.

1998-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980512

1996-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960216

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-09-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1996-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB