Global Patent Index - EP 0742038 B1

EP 0742038 B1 2000-08-30 - Filter for heating installation

Title (en)

Filter for heating installation

Title (de)

Heizungsfilter

Title (fr)

Filtre pour installation de chauffage

Publication

EP 0742038 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96106243 A

Priority

DE 19516724 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0742038A2] The device has a filter insert formed by a brush (5) having a shaft (4) with fibres or fibre tufts (6) protruding radially therefrom. The distance between the individual fibres or tufts circumferentially round the shaft and/or axially along the shaft is at least so great that even with a completely covered fibre surface or after the undesired build-up of filter cakes there is still a sufficiently large free cross-section in the housing for the water to flow through to prevent nominal pressure loss in the apparatus. The outer diameter of each brush is smaller than the corresponding inner diameter of the housing at this point so that there is a space between the inside wall of the housing and brush which is not filled with fibres. Scraper elements are set inside the housing so that relative movement between these and the fibres serves to clean the brush.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 35/10; F24D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/0092 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19516724 A1 19961107; DE 19516724 C2 20000706; AT 195887 T 20000915; EP 0742038 A2 19961113; EP 0742038 A3 19970416; EP 0742038 B1 20000830

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 195887 T

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-04-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605810

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605810 20001005

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-08-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195887 T 20000915

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990914

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990914

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970405

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI