Global Patent Index - EP 0742082 B1

EP 0742082 B1 2001-05-30 - Device for torque transmission for hand tools

Title (en)

Device for torque transmission for hand tools

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Drehmomentübertragung bei Handwerkzeuggeräten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transmission de couple pour des outils à main

Publication

EP 0742082 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810136 A

Priority

DE 19516034 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0742082A1] The device for transmitting turning moment in hand tools has a tool (1) which is inserted into a tool holder (5). The tool clamping shaft (2) has axially extending engaging faces (31) which are held in corresponding counter faces (6) in the tool holder. A retaining slot in the tool (4) acts together with retainers (7) in the tool holder to form a locking mechanism for the tool which allows for certain limited axial movement of the tool. The slot on the clamping shaft of the tool works in conjunction with a catch element (8) in the tool holder which has limited radial and axial movement. The axial movement of the tool is determined at least partially by the limited axial movement of the catch element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/58 (2006.01); B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25B 21/02 (2006.01); B25B 23/00 (2006.01); B25D 17/08 (2006.01); F16D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/0042 (2013.01); B25B 23/0035 (2013.01); B25D 17/088 (2013.01); B25D 2217/0034 (2013.01); B25D 2217/0042 (2013.01); B25D 2250/301 (2013.01); Y10T 279/17094 (2013.01); Y10T 408/907 (2013.01); Y10T 408/95 (2013.01); Y10T 408/953 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19516034 A1 19961107; AT 201625 T 20010615; DK 0742082 T3 20010730; EP 0742082 A1 19961113; EP 0742082 B1 20010530; JP 3557039 B2 20040825; JP H08300269 A 19961119; US 5704744 A 19980106

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150306

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150306

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150306

2015-12-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150307

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150306

2015-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 201625 T

- Effective date: 20150306

2015-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-10-26 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606978

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140305

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140317

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140311

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140312

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140311

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140311

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-07-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606978 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201625 T 20010615

2001-05-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991222

1997-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961127

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE