Global Patent Index - EP 0742086 B1

EP 0742086 B1 2001-05-09 - Process for making ceramic flat articles and ceramic articles made by this process

Title (en)

Process for making ceramic flat articles and ceramic articles made by this process

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von flachen keramischen Produkten und mit dem Verfahren hergestellte keramische Produkte

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'éléments plans en céramique et éléments en céramique obtenus par ce procédé

Publication

EP 0742086 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115543 A

Priority

DE 19517566 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19517566C1] The method involves the blanks of ceramic material being shaped, dried and fired. After drying, the blanks are smoothed on their narrow side (2) to form a surface on which they stand. The tiles are smoothed by being ground or milled. The top folded side is smoothed. The narrow side has at least two protuberances (12,14) which are smoothed on the same plane, at right angles to the product's main plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 11/08; B28B 11/24; E04D 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/08 (2006.01); B28B 11/24 (2006.01); E04D 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/0845 (2013.01); B28B 11/243 (2013.01); E04D 1/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29515692 U1 19951123; AT 201001 T 20010515; DE 19517566 C1 19960530; EP 0742086 A2 19961113; EP 0742086 A3 19970716; EP 0742086 B1 20010509

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061010

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061011

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061006

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MULLER HARTWIG

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO ING. ALFREDO RAIMONDI

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509241 20010613

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

2001-05-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201001 T 20010515

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000914

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970827

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

1997-03-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL