Global Patent Index - EP 0742104 B1

EP 0742104 B1 2000-04-05 - Printing apparatus

Title (en)

Printing apparatus

Title (de)

Druckgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil d'impression

Publication

EP 0742104 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96107863 A

Priority

  • EP 92304685 A
  • JP 11978891 A
  • JP 27067591 A
  • JP 9475091 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0742104A2] A printing apparatus comprising a printing paper supply unit (1) and a printing unit (3) having a thermal printing head wherein said printing unit (3) includes a thermal printing head (7) which moves to be close to or separated from a platen roller (6), and prints the printing paper by heating said thermal head, wherein said printing head (3) is supported by a supporting member (21) which is tiltable with respect to the axis of said platen roller and is movable in forward and reverse directions with respect to the conveying direction of the printing paper, and is positioned at predetermined position of said platen roller by a guide member on moving to printing position, said apparatus further comprising a right and left frame (84); a pair of pins (84a) adjacent said right and left frame, which have their axis parallel to the axis of said platen roller (6); and a guide plate (21g), at both ends of a holding member (21) holding said thermal head (7), which contacts sad pins (84a), and positions said thermal head (7); wherein the other end of said holding member (21) is supported by a supporting bush (81) which is rotatably pivoted by a supporting shaft (24) of said thermal head (7) through a spring (82) which forces said guide plate (21g) in the direction to be always contacted with said pins (84a). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 13/036; B41J 25/316

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/325 (2006.01); B41J 13/00 (2006.01); B41J 13/036 (2006.01); B41J 13/10 (2006.01); B41J 17/32 (2006.01); B41J 25/304 (2006.01); B41J 25/316 (2006.01); B41J 29/377 (2006.01); B41J 35/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/325 (2013.01); B41J 13/00 (2013.01); B41J 13/10 (2013.01); B41J 17/32 (2013.01); B41J 25/304 (2013.01); B41J 25/316 (2013.01); B41J 29/377 (2013.01); B41J 35/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0742104 A2 19961113; EP 0742104 A3 19970917; EP 0742104 B1 20000405; DE 69230894 D1 20000511; DE 69230894 T2 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060522

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060522

2005-05-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050519

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-05-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050518

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-05-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050511

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69230894

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 515224

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980605

1997-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960517

1996-11-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 515224

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB