Global Patent Index - EP 0742161 B1

EP 0742161 B1 2000-10-18 - Tubular packaging

Title (en)

Tubular packaging

Title (de)

Rohrförmige Verpackung

Title (fr)

Emballage tubulaire

Publication

EP 0742161 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96303221 A

Priority

GB 9509664 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0742161A1] An article, such as a curtain track, is packaged by forming a tube (1) of sheet material, e.g. pvc, inserting the article in the tube and closing at least one end of the tube by flattening the respective end portion (10), folding that portion over upon itself and then attaching a closure clip (2) to the folded part (11) to hold the tube end closed. The closure clip has a pocket (17) in which the folded part is received and retained. Both ends of the tube may be closed in the same way. Pleats (9) formed in the wall of the tube enable the or each flattened end portion (10) to be contained within the general width of the tube. A tear strip (7) along the tube enables it to be opened for removal of the article. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0742161 A1 19961113; EP 0742161 B1 20001018; DE 69610659 D1 20001123; DE 69610659 T2 20010215; GB 2300617 A 19961113; GB 2300617 B 19981021; GB 9509664 D0 19950705; GB 9609570 D0 19960710

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NEWELL INVESTMENTS INC.

- Effective date: 20050531

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050508

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NEWELL INVESTMENTS INC.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-11-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051105

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050508

2005-05-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050508

2004-10-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041012

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041007

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041006

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610659 20001123

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEWELL INVESTMENTS INC.

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991015

1999-11-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TUBULAR PACKAGING

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970505

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT