Global Patent Index - EP 0742299 B1

EP 0742299 B1 2002-09-04 - Thread selecting device

Title (en)

Thread selecting device

Title (de)

Fadenwahlvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de selection de fil

Publication

EP 0742299 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96107117 A

Priority

JP 10962595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0742299A2] In the thread selecting device, a link is connected to an arm, moving up and down in synchronism with the action of a weaving machine, and the link pivots when the arm moves up and down. Pivoting links lift a plurality of threads via a plurality of knives, the thread lift distance varying according to the pivot angle of the arm. By providing a mechanism which moves the connection point between the arm and the link along an arc having a radius equal to the length of the arm, the lift distance of the thread may be varied without varying the lift position of the thread. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 3/36; D03C 1/14; D03C 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 3/32 (2006.01); D03C 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 3/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0742299 A2 19961113; EP 0742299 A3 19980107; EP 0742299 B1 20020904; DE 69623383 D1 20021010; DE 69623383 T2 20030109; JP H08302536 A 19961119

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040506

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030627

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030506

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623383 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991222

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960506

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT