Global Patent Index - EP 0742304 B1

EP 0742304 B1 2000-06-28 - Yarn feeding device

Title (en)

Yarn feeding device

Title (de)

Fadenzuliefervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Fournisseur de fil

Publication

EP 0742304 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96105500 A

Priority

DE 19516719 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0742304A1] An appts. for delivery of, esp. elastomer, yarns has a housing (3) which has a case enclosing an inner space and is divided into sub-units (10, 11) along a separation joint (8). In the housing is, rotating about an axis (12), at least a first load shaft (13, 13') held firmly in place and, rotating about an axis (12'), at least a second load shaft (14, 14') held at a distance from and parallel to the first. The shafts extend through and can be inserted transversely w.r.t. their axes into cut-outs in the case of at least one of the housing sub-units and at least one shaft is turned by a drive. Fasteners connect the sub-units together and there is a fixture (6) for mounting the housing on a machine frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 49/34 (2006.01); D04B 15/48 (2006.01); D04B 15/50 (2006.01); D04B 15/60 (2006.01); D04B 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19516719 A1 19961107; DE 19516719 C2 19980212; BR 9602117 A 19980630; CN 1062041 C 20010214; CN 1138113 A 19961218; CZ 284083 B6 19980812; CZ 9601202 A3 19961211; EE 03700 B1 20020415; EE 9600024 A 19961216; EG 21274 A 20010630; EP 0742304 A1 19961113; EP 0742304 B1 20000628; ES 2147323 T3 20000901; GR 3034036 T3 20001130; HK 1011714 A1 20001229; IN 184152 B 20000624; JP 3100902 B2 20001023; JP H08302547 A 19961119; KR 100218069 B1 19990901; MX 9601675 A 19970731; PE 41396 A1 19961008; RO 116655 B1 20010430; RU 2126360 C1 19990220; SK 284083 B6 20040908; SK 56796 A3 19970305; TR 9600363 A2 19961121; TW 327661 B 19980301; US 5716024 A 19980210

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140405

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605482

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605482

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080407

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080405

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080407

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080405

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061102

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070418

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-04-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-27 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20060405

2005-04-21 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147323 T3

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605482 20000803

2000-07-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19960501;LV PAYMENT 19960501

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981029

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970411

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT

1996-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 960501;LV PAYMENT 960501

1996-11-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 960501;LV PAYMENT 960501