Global Patent Index - EP 0742305 B1

EP 0742305 B1 2000-12-20 - Permeable fabrics

Title (en)

Permeable fabrics

Title (de)

Durchlässige Stoffe

Title (fr)

Etoffes perméables

Publication

EP 0742305 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96303164 A

Priority

GB 9508982 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0742305A1] The invention relates to a laminated fabric which is permeable to gas and/or vapour but possesses water droplet and solid particle barrier properties. The fabric comprises at least two layers of non-woven material, one layer (1; 4; 7) being a compressed fibrous melt-blown material and the other(s) provided by a support layer having an open porous structure. In the examples, the support layers (2; 3,5; 6,8) have a spun-bonded structure. The melt-blown layer (1; 4; 7) of the fabric may be compressed prior to lamination from an average pore size diameter greater than 8 mu m to a diameter approaching or entering a range of pore diameter sizes from 8 mu m down to about 1 mu m preferably between 3-7 mu m and most preferably about 4 mu m. After a point-bonding or calendering technique, the pore diameter of the melt-blown layer (1; 4; 7) will be within the range 1-8 mu m, preferably 2-7 mu m and most preferably between 2-4 mu m. Advantageously, both the melt-blown layers and the spun-bonded layers may comprise polymers of polypropylene and/or polyethylene. The finished fabric may advantageously be useful in a wide range of applications from bedding materials and sportswear to tarpaulins, camping equipment such as tents, and roofing underlays. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 13/00 (2006.01); E04D 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 13/00 (2013.01); E04D 12/002 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0742305 A1 19961113; EP 0742305 B1 20001220; EP 0742305 B2 20040804; DE 69611264 D1 20010125; DE 69611264 T2 20010705; DE 69611264 T3 20050310; GB 9508982 D0 19950621

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160502

2016-05-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160502

2016-05-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69611264

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150508

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150428

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-06-17 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2004-08-04 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HUNT TECHNOLOGY LIMITED

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-01-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611264 20010125

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DON & LOW LIMITED

1998-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980209

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961031

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB