Global Patent Index - EP 0742318 B1

EP 0742318 B1 2000-09-13 - Measures for the reduction of airborne noise in rail traffic especially in slab tracks for railborne traffic and method for the execution of the measures

Title (en)

Measures for the reduction of airborne noise in rail traffic especially in slab tracks for railborne traffic and method for the execution of the measures

Title (de)

Massnahmen zur Luftschallverminderung bei Schienenverkehrswegen, vornehmlich bei Festen Fahrbahnen für schienengebundenen Verkehr und Verfahren zur Durchführung der Massnahmen

Title (fr)

Mesures pour la réduction du bruit aérien en trafic ferroviaire particulièrement en voies sans ballast pour trafic roulant sur rails et procédé de l'exécution des mesures

Publication

EP 0742318 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96107314 A

Priority

  • DE 19517384 A
  • DE 19529754 A
  • DE 19535880 A
  • DE 19537621 A
  • DE 19602521 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0742318A1] In track systems for rail vehicles, air-borne noise is reduced by an arrangement of packing (6) of loose material in a suitable casing (8) positioned between and/or at the sides of the rails (5) and on and/or in front of the free surfaces and side faces of the supporting structure (3,4) outside the vehicle profile (7). Pref. the casing comprises a mesh container or basket of rigid dimensions, with mesh apertures small enough to prevent material escaping. It pref. consists of corrosion-resistant plastic, e.g. of polyethylene, polypropylene, polyamide, polycarbonate, polyester, polyacrylic or mixtures of these, or of glass fibres or plastic-coated glass fibres. Also claimed is a method for preparing and placing of the packed material. Effective noise redn. by method capable of automation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 1/00; E01B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/00 (2006.01); E01B 2/00 (2006.01); E01B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/002 (2013.01); E01B 1/001 (2013.01); E01B 2/00 (2013.01); E01B 19/003 (2013.01); E01B 2204/02 (2013.01); E01B 2204/06 (2013.01); E01B 2204/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0742318 A1 19961113; EP 0742318 B1 20000913; AT 196333 T 20000915; DK 0742318 T3 20010102; ES 2093594 T1 19970101; ES 2093594 T3 20001201; PT 742318 E 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040510

2005-05-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-01-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20041109

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040509

2004-12-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PFLEIDERER INFRASTRUKTURTECHNIK G.M.B.H. & CO. K.

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-11-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041109

2004-06-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040510

2004-05-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040510

2004-05-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040509

2004-05-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040509

2003-05-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-22 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030507

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-04 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030404

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-03 [REG FR RM] CORRECTION OF A MATERIAL ERROR

2001-03-28 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DIE ERFINDER HABEN AUF IHRE NENNUNG VERZICHTET

2001-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001103

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-12-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: LENZI & C.

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2093594 T3

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605864 20001019

2000-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196333 T 20000915

2000-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PFLEIDERER INFRASTRUKTURTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990302

1997-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961213

1997-02-03 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1997-01-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2093594 T1

1996-12-27 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1996-12-11 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1996-11-28 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: LENZI & C.

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE