Global patent index - EP 0742326 B1

EP 0742326 B1 2000-01-19 - Floor and wall tiles

Title (en)

Floor and wall tiles

Title (de)

Fliesen und Platten für Bodenbeläge und Wandbekleidungen

Title (fr)

Carreaux et dalles pour sols et murs

Publication

EP 0742326 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96107344 A

Priority

DE 19517183 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0742326A1] The tile (D) is attached to a base layer (B) which provides a thermal insulation and which is provided with a bedding layer. The edges of the base layer have lugs (3) which are positioned asymmetrically to form a laying pattern with adjacent tiles. The grouting compound secures the tiles. The tiles overlap the base layers to form a profiled keying cross-section for the grout. The jointing lugs are shortened to enable the tiles to be laid with compensation for tolerances.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 15/08; E04F 13/14; E04F 13/18; E04F 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2006.01); E04F 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2013.01); E04F 15/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0742326 A1 19961113; EP 0742326 B1 20000119; AT 189028 T 20000215; ES 2144170 T3 20000601

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050509

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030611

2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2002-12-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020509

2002-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021031

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-05-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020510

2002-05-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020509

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010529

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-05-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010509

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144170

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-05-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: OBEROSLER LUDWIG

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189028

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981217

1997-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961209

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT