Global Patent Index - EP 0742406 B1

EP 0742406 B1 2000-07-12 - Tank with mounted equipment manhole

Title (en)

Tank with mounted equipment manhole

Title (de)

Tank mit aufgesetztem Ausrüstungsschacht

Title (fr)

Citerne à puits d'équipement rapporté

Publication

EP 0742406 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96400852 A

Priority

FR 9505591 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0742406A1] The tank comprises: (i) a metal shell (1) with an outer polyester or epoxy coating; and (ii) an access well (3) for fittings (2) made from plastic and connected to the outer surface of the tank by a saddle (4) on lower end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 13/06; B65D 90/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/00 (2006.01); B65D 90/10 (2006.01); F17C 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/10 (2013.01); F17C 13/06 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0607 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0636 (2013.01); F17C 2203/066 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0663 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0308 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0123 (2013.01); F17C 2260/053 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0142 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0742406 A1 19961113; EP 0742406 B1 20000712; AT 194694 T 20000715; CZ 289222 B6 20011212; CZ 9601367 A3 19970115; DE 69609243 D1 20000817; DE 69609243 T2 20001123; DK 0742406 T3 20000918; ES 2149434 T3 20001101; FR 2734040 A1 19961115; FR 2734040 B1 19970613; HU 219473 B 20010428; HU 9601260 A2 19970528; HU 9601260 A3 19990301; HU 9601260 D0 19960729; MA 23862 A1 19961231; PL 314167 A1 19961112; PL 59137 Y1 20020531; PT 742406 E 20001229; SK 282388 B6 20020107; SK 59596 A3 19961204; TR 9600372 A1 19961121

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160423

2016-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160502

2016-08-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160801

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160421

2016-06-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 194694

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20160422

2016-05-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160421

2016-05-02 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20160422

2016-04-28 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20160421

2016-04-25 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

- Effective date: 20160422

2016-04-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69609243

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150423

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150409

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150423

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2149434

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609243

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU MC NL PT

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19960506

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194694

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1998-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980714

1997-02-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU MC NL PT

1997-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961113

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU MC NL PT

1996-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT;LV;SI PAYMENT 960506

1996-11-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Free Format Text: LT;LV;SI PAYMENT 960506