Global Patent Index - EP 0742407 B1

EP 0742407 B1 2000-09-13 - Lighting device for a motor vehicle

Title (en)

Lighting device for a motor vehicle

Title (de)

Kfz-Leuchte

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'éclairage pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0742407 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96107397 A

Priority

IT TO950381 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0742407A1] Lighting device (1) comprising a non-parabolic reflector (3) with a continuous complex reflective surface that directly distributes the light beam in accordance with the regulations without the use of an external diffusing lens. The reflective surface is made up of four surface portions (4) generated by reflecting a portion bounded by a horizontal section line (5) and a vertical section line (6). The horizontal and vertical section lines (5) and (6) are chosen to provide the desired distribution of the luminous flux on the section in question and one is then transformed continuously into the other along a guide line (7) to generate the intermediate sections (15) in such a way that each point on the horizontal section line is moved to a corresponding point on the vertical section line. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 7/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1317 (2013.01); F21S 48/1358 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0742407 A1 19961113; EP 0742407 B1 20000913; DE 69610245 D1 20001019; DE 69610245 T2 20010222; ES 2151103 T3 20001216; IT 1279204 B1 19971204; IT TO950381 A1 19961112; IT TO950381 D0 19950512

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2005-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050719

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-12-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020509

2002-05-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020510

2002-05-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020509

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010524

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010516

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151103 T3

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610245 20001019

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 7/09 A

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING ITALIA SPA

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990212

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960928

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB