Global Patent Index - EP 0742408 B1

EP 0742408 B1 2003-06-25 - Motor vehicle headlamp comprising stray light shielding means and lamp including such shielding means

Title (en)

Motor vehicle headlamp comprising stray light shielding means and lamp including such shielding means

Title (de)

Kfz-Scheinwerfer mit Abschirmungsmitteln gegen Streulicht sowie Lampe mit solchen Abschirmungsmitteln

Title (fr)

Projecteur de véhicule automobile comportant des moyens d'occultation de la lumière parasite, et lampe pourvue de tels moyens d'occultation

Publication

EP 0742408 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401019 A

Priority

FR 9505514 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0742408A1] The vehicle headlamp has a bulb (12) with a light source in its interior. The lamp is at the end of an extended arm serving as connector and support (17). The lamp is placed at the focus of a parabolic reflector (20), and a front glass closes the lamp. The lamp has a screen (12a,12b) positioned to block some of the light emerging from the lamp and creating a dark zone on the reflector. A second screen (13a,13b) masks a part of the reflector that would normally receive parasitic light generated by reflection from the connector/support structure carrying the lamp. The screens are formed by generally radially plates. A screen (18) directly in front of the lamp blocks emission of light directly from the light source.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 11/16; F21V 17/04; F21S 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 41/435 (2018.01); F21S 41/17 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0742408 A1 19961113; EP 0742408 B1 20030625; DE 69628787 D1 20030731; DE 69628787 T2 20040519; ES 2201159 T3 20040316; FR 2734043 A1 19961115; FR 2734043 B1 19970801

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130511

2014-06-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140611

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130510

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69628787

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120615

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120514

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080510

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080510

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201159 T3

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69628787 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 11/16 A, 7F 21S 8/10 B, 7F 21V 17/04 B

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010220

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970505

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT