Global Patent Index - EP 0742409 B1

EP 0742409 B1 2002-11-13 - Motor vehicle multifunction signal light comprising catadioptric and pseudocatadioptric elements

Title (en)

Motor vehicle multifunction signal light comprising catadioptric and pseudocatadioptric elements

Title (de)

Kfz-Multifunktionssignalleuchte mit Rückstrahlern und Pseudorückstrahlern

Title (fr)

Feu de signalisation multifonctions pour véhicule automobile, équipé d'éléments catadioptriques et pseudo-catadioptriques

Publication

EP 0742409 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96400972 A

Priority

FR 9505476 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0742409A1] The multiple function signalling light comprises a base which defines an assembly of compartments separating individual light sources and covered by the cover glass. The cover glass includes a first region (18) which serves as a reflector lens, reflecting incident light, and a second region (20) which offers a number of pseudo-reflector elements. These pseudo-reflector elements each have a lamp behind them, whilst externally appearing similar to the reflector elements in ambient light. Inside the pseudo-reflector elements on the internal surface of the cover glass there is a prismatic surface serving to deflect the light in the required vertical and horizontal directions. This gives the light the required radiation pattern, whilst retaining an externally smooth surface appearance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 43/26 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0742409 A1 19961113; EP 0742409 B1 20021113; DE 69624754 D1 20021219; DE 69624754 T2 20030814; ES 2186761 T3 20030516; FR 2733949 A1 19961115; FR 2733949 B1 19970801

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160508

2016-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160826

2016-05-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69624754

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150512

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150508

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070507

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070507

2006-04-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186761 T3

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69624754 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 8/10 A

2001-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010109

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970505

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT