Global Patent Index - EP 0742455 B1

EP 0742455 B1 2001-12-12 - Scale, method of fabricating a scale and a position measuring device

Title (en)

Scale, method of fabricating a scale and a position measuring device

Title (de)

Ma stab und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Ma stabes sowie Positionsmesseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Echelle et méthode de fabrication d'une échelle ainsi qu'un dispositif de mesure de position

Publication

EP 0742455 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95105584 A

Priority

EP 95105584 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH08286020A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a phase grating of a position measuring apparatus having excellent optical properties and easy to be manufactured and provide a manufac turing method of the phase grid. SOLUTION: In a phase grating for a photoelectric position measuring apparatus in which two reflecting layers 2, 4, of which one reflecting layer 2 is even in the whole layer and the other reflecting layer 4 is formed as an amplitude grating, are formed at a distance having one transparent intermittent layer 3 between them; the intermittent layer 3 is in a region mainly between the two reflecting layers 2, 4 opposed mutually in parallel and the layer 3 forms webs having vertically extended end parts and the index of refraction differs in both sides of the end parts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/00 (2006.01); G02B 5/18 (2006.01); G03F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03F 9/70 (2013.01); G02B 5/1857 (2013.01); G02B 5/1861 (2013.01); Y10S 359/90 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19608978 A1 19961017; AT 210832 T 20011215; DE 59509940 D1 20020124; EP 0742455 A1 19961113; EP 0742455 B1 20011212; JP 2891332 B2 19990517; JP H08286020 A 19961101; US 5786931 A 19980728

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59509940

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130413

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130413

2013-11-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090413

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090413

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080412

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080426

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020222

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509940 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210832 T 20011215

2001-09-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-07-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SCALE, METHOD OF FABRICATING A SCALE AND A POSITION MEASURING DEVICE

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001020

1997-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961122

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI