Global Patent Index - EP 0742869 B1

EP 0742869 B1 2000-05-31 - SCROLL-TYPE FLUID DISPLACEMENT DEVICE HAVING HIGH BUILT-IN VOLUME RATIO AND SEMI-COMPLIANT BIASING MECHANISM

Title (en)

SCROLL-TYPE FLUID DISPLACEMENT DEVICE HAVING HIGH BUILT-IN VOLUME RATIO AND SEMI-COMPLIANT BIASING MECHANISM

Title (de)

VERDRÄNGERMASCHINE NACH DEM SPIRALPRINZIP

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DEPLACEMENT DE FLUIDE DU TYPE A SPIRALES A RAPPORT ELEVE DE VOLUMES PROPRES ET MECANISME DE PRESSION SEMI-ELASTIQUE

Publication

EP 0742869 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94912735 A

Priority

US 9401031 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9520719A1] A scroll-type fluid displacement apparatus has two interfitting spiral-shaped scroll members (50, 60) which have predetermined geometric configurations. The novel design provides desired displacement and a high built-in volume ratio, while at the same time achieving the optimum number of turns. The two scroll members can be either identical (Fig. 8) or non-identical (Fig. 9). One scroll member (60) is non-orbital and movable along its center axis (S2). The non-orbital scroll member is urged by forces, mechanical (70) or pneumatic (496), toward the other scroll member and is stopped by a positioning mechanism (24) such that gaps (65) are maintained between tips of one scroll member and bases (51, 61) of the other scroll member. A stabilizing mechanism (162, 20, 261, 362, 466) prevents the scroll members from tipping. When abnormal operating conditions arise, for example, when contaminants or incompressible liquids move between the scroll members, or, when the tips and bases of the scroll members contact each other due to abnormal thermal growth, the non-orbital scroll member moves against the urging force along the direction of its center axis. Thus, galling may be prevented.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/02; F04C 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 1/02 (2006.01); F04C 18/02 (2006.01); F04C 27/00 (2006.01); F04C 28/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 28/28 (2013.01); F04C 18/0246 (2013.01); F04C 27/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9520719 A1 19950803; AU 6532094 A 19950815; DE 69424803 D1 20000706; DE 69424803 T2 20001012; EP 0742869 A1 19961120; EP 0742869 A4 19970502; EP 0742869 B1 20000531; JP 3445794 B2 20030908; JP H09507548 A 19970729

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120126

2012-11-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69424803

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120127

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-09-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424803 20000706

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1998-06-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980417

1997-05-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19970312

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1997-04-23 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04C 18/02

1996-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960814

1996-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE