Global Patent Index - EP 0743026 B1

EP 0743026 B1 2000-08-30 - Jewelry device

Title (en)

Jewelry device

Title (de)

Schmuckstück

Title (fr)

Bijou

Publication

EP 0743026 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95107595 A

Priority

EP 95107595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0743026A1] The invention refers to a jewelry device, comprising two transparent coverplates (2, 3) arranged parallel with mutual distance and connected to each other by a connecting rim (4) wherein an object movable by external influence is provided between said cover plates. According to the invention the object (1) is secured parallel to the cover plates (2, 3) on a ball bearing axle (4) allowing movement of the object parallel to the cover plates (2, 3). The weight axis of the object (1) is arranged parallel with a certain distance to the fastening axle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 13/00; A44C 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 13/00 (2006.01); A44C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 17/0275 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0743026 A1 19961120; EP 0743026 B1 20000830; DE 69518628 D1 20001005; DE 69518628 T2 20010426

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2014-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130827

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2005-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050429

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. ETH H. R. WERFFELI PATENTANWALT

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518628 20001005

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990420

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970405

1996-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI