Global Patent Index - EP 0743031 A3

EP 0743031 A3 2000-12-27 - Drawer slide

Title (en)

Drawer slide

Title (de)

Schubkastenauszugsführung

Title (fr)

Glissière pour tiroir

Publication

EP 0743031 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96105928 A

Priority

DE 29507916 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0743031A2] The running gear of the drawer comprises fixed rails on the drawer and the furniture body and a freely moving intermediate rail between the fixed rails. Each fixed rail is supported on opposite sides of the intermediate rail by caged bearings. The pressed metal cage (15) has shaped cut-outs (18) for the bearings and is fitted with elastic rollers (19) in the end cut-outs to act as end stops. The bearings are roller- or ball types. The end elastic rollers interact with pressed tags in the fixed rails to limit the end extension of the drawer without sudden impacts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/04; A47B 88/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/487 (2017.01); A47B 2210/0032 (2013.01); A47B 2210/0035 (2013.01); A47B 2210/004 (2013.01); A47B 2210/0056 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29507916 U1 19950810; AT 245373 T 20030815; EP 0743031 A2 19961120; EP 0743031 A3 20001227; EP 0743031 B1 20030723; ES 2200018 T3 20040301; US 5775788 A 19980707

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160417

2016-07-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160727

2016-06-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 245373 T

- Effective date: 20160416

2016-04-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59610614

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200018 T3

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610614 P 20030828

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020523

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010612

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47B 88/04 A, 7A 47B 88/14 B

1996-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT