Global Patent Index - EP 0743200 B1

EP 0743200 B1 2000-03-29 - Radial agricultural tire with a pitched tread

Title (en)

Radial agricultural tire with a pitched tread

Title (de)

Radialer Landwirtschaftsreifen mit einer Lauffläche von verschiedenen Pitch-Längen

Title (fr)

Bandage pneumatique radial pour véhicule agricole ayant un profil à pas variable

Publication

EP 0743200 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96107574 A

Priority

US 44514595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5733394A] The present invention relates to an agricultural tire (10) having a casing (12) with a radial ply carcass (14) and an annular tread (40) having two sets (48,50) of lugs (44). The tire (10) has a greatly reduced lug vibration. The tread (10) is divided into a plurality of circumferentially repeating design cycles of at least two, preferably three distinct design cycle lengths. The circumferentially adjacent lugs (44) of the opposite set are offset by at least one design cycle. When the pitch ratio variance of the design cycles is at least 1.1 from small length (S) to large length (L), preferably 1.25 a reduction in lug induced vibration of 30% or more is possible. The lugs 44 preferably have a lug width (W), (W) being proportional to the length of the design cycle in which a majority of the lug lies. This effectively balances the mass of tread rubber around the periphery of the tire.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60C 11/00; B60C 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 11/00 (2006.01); B60C 11/04 (2006.01); B60C 11/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60C 11/0311 (2013.01); B60C 11/0318 (2013.01); B60C 11/033 (2013.01); Y10T 152/10279 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5733394 A 19980331; AR 001901 A1 19971210; BR 9602184 A 19980407; DE 69607408 D1 20000504; DE 69607408 T2 20001207; EP 0743200 A1 19961120; EP 0743200 B1 20000329; ES 2144171 T3 20000601; TR 9600393 A2 19970321

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070131

2005-05-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050513

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030514

2004-05-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040503

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-05-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030514

2002-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020517

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144171

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607408

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-04

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981211

1996-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960513

1996-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT