Global patent index - EP 0743384 B1

EP 0743384 B1 2000-06-14 - Method for controlling use of compressed air in jet loom and compressed-air supply/control apparatus for the same

Title (en)

Method for controlling use of compressed air in jet loom and compressed-air supply/control apparatus for the same

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung des Gebrauches von Druckluft in Düsenwebmaschinen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la commande de l'utilisation d'air comprimé dans un métier à jet d'air

Publication

EP 0743384 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96104289 A

Priority

JP 11864295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0743384A2] Method and apparatus for properly controlling a status of use of compressed air in a jet loom. A compressed-air supply/control apparatus (5) includes a discharge flow rate determining circuit (6), an inverter (7) constituting a part of a discharge flow rate change-over means, a pulse motor (8) constituting another part of the discharge flow rate change-over means, an air compressor (9) of fixed capacity type, a pressure-responsive on/off switch (10) employed as a pressure detecting means and operation enable/disable decision circuit (14). The pressure-responsive on/off switch (10) serves to detect a pressure within a compressed air supplying passage (11) which extends from the air compressor (9) to the jet loom (1). The operation enable/disable decision circuit responds to an output of a period detecting circuit (15) to thereby issue an operation stop signal (S) to the loom control computer C0 when an on-state of the pressure-responsive on/off switch (10) continues for a period longer than a preset one. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/30 (2006.01); D03D 51/00 (2006.01); D03D 51/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/3053 (2013.01); D03D 47/3026 (2013.01); D03D 47/3033 (2013.01); D03D 51/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0743384 A2 19961120; EP 0743384 A3 19970924; EP 0743384 B1 20000614; DE 69608852 D1 20000720; DE 69608852 T2 20001228; JP H08311744 A 19961126; KR 100237261 B1 20000115

INPADOC legal status

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150318

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140307

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2007-03-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-03-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69608852

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-20

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990607

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971016

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

1996-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI