Global Patent Index - EP 0743397 B1

EP 0743397 B1 2000-08-09 - Parking barrier

Title (en)

Parking barrier

Title (de)

Absperrvorrichtung für Parkplätze

Title (fr)

Barrière pour emplacement de stationnement

Publication

EP 0743397 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96303416 A

Priority

GB 9509778 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0743397A1] An obstruction or barrier unit for protecting a parking space, comprises an obstruction member (12) arranged to move between raised and lowered positions, an actuator (18) arranged to receive fluid under pressure to move the obstruction from one position to the other, a storage means (26) for storing fluid under pressure, valve means (22) arranged to be remotely controlled to allow fluid to flow from the primary storage means (26) to the actuator (18), and recharging means (27, 29) which respond to depression by the wheels of a vehicle to recharge the storage means (26). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0743397 A1 19961120; EP 0743397 B1 20000809; DE 69609662 D1 20000914; DE 69609662 T2 20010412; GB 9509778 D0 19950705

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609662 20000914

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-08-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: C F ANDERSON AND SON LIMITED

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CASSWELL, MICHAEL CARWELL

1998-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980603

1997-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970516

1996-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL