Global Patent Index - EP 0743400 B1

EP 0743400 B1 2000-10-25 - Height-adjustable manhole cover

Title (en)

Height-adjustable manhole cover

Title (de)

Höhenverstellbare Schachtabdeckung

Title (fr)

Couvercle de regard, ajustable en hauteur

Publication

EP 0743400 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810276 A

Priority

CH 149395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0743400A1] The drain cover (4) is held level with the road surface in a lipped metal ring (2) which is itself held over a concrete support base ring (1). Elastomer padding (6) between the metal ring and the base ring hold the metal ring while a concrete levelling layer (10) is placed under the metal ring. The elastomer pads are positioned around the base ring and can be made of a thermoplastic material. When the road surface is raised the metal ring is raised to align the top edge with the new road level and is held by the elastomer padding while additional levelling concrete is travelled under the metal ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/1409 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0743400 A1 19961120; EP 0743400 B1 20001025; AT 197181 T 20001115; CH 690444 A5 20000915; DE 59606033 D1 20001130; DK 0743400 T3 20010205

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VONROLL INFRATEC (INVESTMENT) AG

- Free text: VONROLL INFRATEC (INVESTMENT) AG#BAHNHOFSTRASSE 23#6300 ZUG (CH) -TRANSFER TO- VONROLL INFRATEC (INVESTMENT) AG#BAHNHOFSTRASSE 23#6300 ZUG (CH)

2007-09-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VONROLL HYDROTEC SA

- Free text: VON ROLL INFRANET SA# #2830 CHOINDEZ (CH) -TRANSFER TO- VONROLL HYDROTEC SA# #2830 CHOINDEZ (CH)

2007-09-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: VONROLL INFRATEC (INVESTMENT) AG

- Free text: VONROLL HYDROTEC SA# #2830 CHOINDEZ (CH) -TRANSFER TO- VONROLL INFRATEC (INVESTMENT) AG#BAHNHOFSTRASSE 23#6300 ZUG (CH)

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-11-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-06-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-05-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: VON ROLL INFRANET SA

- Free text: VON ROLL HOLDING AG#BAHNHOFSTRASSE#4563 GERLAFINGEN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- VON ROLL INFRANET SA##2830 CHOINDEZ (CH)

2003-04-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030423

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-16 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030416

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030328

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606033 20001130

2000-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI

2000-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197181 T 20001115

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990311

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990311

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970110

1996-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI