Global Patent Index - EP 0743574 B1

EP 0743574 B1 2000-12-27 - Migration imaging members

Title (en)

Migration imaging members

Title (de)

Bilderzeugungselemente nach dem Migrationsverfahren

Title (fr)

Eléments de formation d'images par migration

Publication

EP 0743574 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96303360 A

Priority

US 42222795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0743574A2] Disclosed is a migration imaging member (1) comprising (a) a substrate (2), (b) a softenable layer (6) comprising a softenable material (7) and a photosensitive migration marking material (8), and (c) a transparentizing agent which transparentizes migration marking material in contact therewith contained in at least one layer of the migration imaging member. Also disclosed is a process which comprises (1) providing a migration imaging member (1) comprising (a) a substrate (2), (b) a softenable layer (6) comprising a softenable material (7) and a photosensitive migration marking material (8), and (c) a transparentizing agent which transparentizes migration marking material in contact therewith contained in at least one layer of the migration imaging member; (2) uniformly charging the imaging member; (3) subsequent to step (2), exposing the charged imaging member to activating radiation at a wavelength to which the migration marking material is sensitive; (4) subsequent to step (3), causing the softenable material to soften and enabling a first portion of the migration marking material to migrate through the softenable material toward the substrate in an imagewise pattern while a second portion of the migration marking material remains substantially unmigrated within the softenable layer, wherein subsequent to migration of the first portion of migration marking material, either (a) the first portion of migration marking material contacts the transparentizing agent and the second portion of migration marking material does not contact the transparentizing agent; or (b) the second portion of migration marking material contacts the transparentizing agent and the first portion of migration marking material does not contact the transparentizing agent. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 17/10; G03G 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 17/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 17/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0743574 A2 19961120; EP 0743574 A3 19970305; EP 0743574 B1 20001227; DE 69611319 D1 20010201; DE 69611319 T2 20010426

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040514

2003-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030514

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030508

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611319

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-01

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990121

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970905

1997-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MALHOTRA, SHADI L.

1997-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHEN, LIQIN

1997-04-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PERRON, MARIE-EVE

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MALHOTRA, SHADI L.

1997-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHEN, LIQIN

1997-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PERRON, MARIE-EVE

1996-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB