Global patent index - EP 0743664 B1

EP 0743664 B1 2001-02-28 - Electrical switchgear

Title (en)

Electrical switchgear

Title (de)

Elektrisches Schaltgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de commutation électrique

Publication

EP 0743664 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96107564 A

Priority

DE 19518094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0743664A2] The device has an actuation element e.g. a rocker (18), which returns to its initial position after actuation, and a slider (16) actuated by it with at least one pendulum device (20) suspended from it and a switching element (14) which works in conjunction with the slider and pendulum device and actuates at least one contact arrangement (24). A spring (22) is arranged on the slider on the deflection side of the associated pendulum. The spring, which returns the deflected pendulum to its initial position, is a flat spring which engages the pendulum by engaging an aperture (23) in the pendulum at the end remote from its pivot point.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 23/26; H01H 23/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 21/24 (2006.01); H01H 23/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 21/245 (2013.01); H01H 23/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0743664 A2 19961120; EP 0743664 A3 19980506; EP 0743664 B1 20010228; AT 199466 T 20010315; DE 19518094 A1 19961121

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2002-12-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-07-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-05-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010513

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606479

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-05

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE NL

2001-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199466

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000725

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980522

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE NL

1996-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE NL