Global Patent Index - EP 0743665 B1

EP 0743665 B1 2002-09-18 - Circuit breaker

Title (en)

Circuit breaker

Title (de)

Leistungsschalter

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur

Publication

EP 0743665 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810265 A

Priority

DE 19517615 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2172352A1] This circuit breaker has a cylindrically designed arcing chamber (1), filled with an insulant medium, which has a power current path, arranged in an insulant housing (12) and stretched along a longitudinal axis (2), with a fixed contact arrangement (3) arranged in the power current path, and with a contact arrangement (5) having a moving contact cage (8), both the fixed contact arrangement (3) and the contact arrangement (5) each being provided with a fixed erosion-resistant covering (7, 10). In addition, a blast volume which accumulates the increased pressure of the insulant medium which occurs during a breaking process is provided. The invention is to provide a circuit breaker in which the contact erosion is reduced by simple means. This is achieved in that in the on position, the contact cage (8) surrounds a guide part (4) designed to be electrically insulant, and in that the insulant housing (12) has a shoulder (13) which projects into the region between a first covering (7) and a second covering (10), and in that the two erosion-resistant coverings (7, 10) are arranged concentrically around the region of the moving contact cage (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/72; H01H 33/98

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/70 (2006.01); H01H 33/74 (2006.01); H01H 33/18 (2006.01); H01H 33/72 (2006.01); H01H 33/98 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/7015 (2013.01); H01H 33/18 (2013.01); H01H 33/72 (2013.01); H01H 33/982 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19517615 A1 19961114; BR 9602218 A 19980407; CA 2172352 A1 19961114; CN 1076515 C 20011219; CN 1137160 A 19961204; EP 0743665 A2 19961120; EP 0743665 A3 19980422; EP 0743665 B1 20020918; JP H08321233 A 19961203; KR 100409412 B1 20040409; US 5844189 A 19981201

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070425

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060425

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060425

2005-04-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050418

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050418

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050412

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050412

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABB BUSINESS SERVICES LTD INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY (S

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609674 20021024

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020312

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980911

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE