Global Patent Index - EP 0743978 B1

EP 0743978 B1 2001-04-25 - BLEACHING TABLET WITH BUILDER SUBSTANCES

Title (en)

BLEACHING TABLET WITH BUILDER SUBSTANCES

Title (de)

BLEICHTABLETTE MIT BUILDERSUBSTANZEN

Title (fr)

COMPRIME DE BLANCHIMENT CONTENANT DES ADJUVANTS

Publication

EP 0743978 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95908245 A

Priority

  • DE 4404279 A
  • EP 9500359 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4404279A1] Washing or cleaning products should be made available in an advantageous form of presentation containing amorphous, semi-crystalline and/or crystalline silicates, improving both the reliability of the process and the stability of any other components of the form of presentation, while maintaining the builder properties. For that purpose, a tablet contains said silicates but water only in amounts that do not exceed the maximum theoretical water-binding capacity of the ingredients. These tablets are easily dissolved in water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/12; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0078 (2013.01); C11D 3/06 (2013.01); C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 3/128 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4404279 A1 19950817; AT 200794 T 20010515; EP 0743978 A1 19961127; EP 0743978 B1 20010425; EP 0965565 A1 19991222; ES 2157320 T3 20010816; US 5900399 A 19990504; WO 9521908 A1 19950817

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060201

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070202

2008-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070202

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-03-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060317

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060213

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060201

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-01-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020901

2002-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020901

2002-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-01-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Free text: BO 01/38 PAGES: 263, IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI

2002-01-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157320 T3

2001-08-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-07-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509220 20010531

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200794 T 20010515

2000-05-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BLEACHING TABLET WITH BUILDER SUBSTANCES

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990701

1996-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960801

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL