Global Patent Index - EP 0744012 B1

EP 0744012 B1 2000-06-14 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DRYING WOOD

Title (en)

METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DRYING WOOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR HOLZTROCKNUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR SECHER DU BOIS

Publication

EP 0744012 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95910047 A

Priority

  • SE 9500145 W
  • SE 9400464 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9522035A1] Method and arrangement for drying of wood by circulating hot air around and through one or more piles (3) of the wood, arranged in batches in one or more closed drying chambers (2 a-f) in a chamber drier (1), the circulating hot air being first caused, in a heating phase, to heat the wood to the starting temperature for drying, subsequently in one or more drying phases accomplishing the actual drying, and finally, in a conditioning phase having a specially adapted air moisture content and air temperature other than during the drying, water vapour being supplied at atmospheric pressure by means (9 a-f), during the heating phase and the conditioning phase, to the hot air circulating around the wood in the drying chamber (1). The water vapour, which is generated in a vapour generator (10) and stored in an accumulator connected thereto, is supplied at a vapour generating capacity of 2-28 kW/m<3>, preferably 10-15 kW/m<3>, batch volume of the wood. The vapour generator (10) can be arranged to be supplied, preferably via a hot water conduit (12), with energy from a solid fuel central boiler plant (13) which is adapted to work by burning sawmill refuse, mainly bark.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 3/04; F26B 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 21/08 (2006.01); F26B 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 21/08 (2013.01); F26B 21/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9522035 A1 19950817; AT 193939 T 20000615; AU 1828495 A 19950829; CZ 289967 B6 20020515; CZ 9602339 A3 19970212; DE 69517515 D1 20000720; DK 0744012 T3 20001023; EE 03255 B1 20000215; EP 0744012 A1 19961127; EP 0744012 B1 20000614; FI 112696 B 20031231; FI 963118 A0 19960808; FI 963118 A 19960808; LV 11640 A 19961220; LV 11640 B 19970820; NO 314856 B1 20030602; NO 963338 A 19960809; NO 963338 D0 19960809; PL 176978 B1 19990831; PL 315667 A1 19961125; SE 505655 C2 19970929; SE 9400464 D0 19940211; SE 9400464 L 19950812

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140213

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140214

2014-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 193939 T

- Effective date: 20140213

2014-09-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130110

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-09-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-04-16 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-02-25 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20031203

2001-10-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010213

2001-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WSAB VIRKESTORKAR AB

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-02-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010213

2001-02-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-11-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-09-15 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-08-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517515 20000720

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19960806

2000-06-14 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2000-06-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193939 T 20000615

1997-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970418

1996-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960806

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

1996-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 960806