Global Patent Index - EP 0744137 B1

EP 0744137 B1 2001-05-02 - Packaging and presentation unit for removably containing at least one product of solid or semi-solid consistency, in particular a cosmetic product

Title (en)

Packaging and presentation unit for removably containing at least one product of solid or semi-solid consistency, in particular a cosmetic product

Title (de)

Einheit zur abnehmbaren Verpackung und zur Präsentation mindestens eines festen oder halbfesten Produktes, insbesondere eines kosmetischen Produktes

Title (fr)

Ensemble pour le conditionnement et la présentation, de façon amovible, d'au moins un produit de consistance solide ou semi-solide, notamment un produit de maquillage

Publication

EP 0744137 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96112915 A

Priority

  • EP 95400964 A
  • FR 9406136 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0685182A1] The products (P,P') are put into cups (6,6') which are held in square cavities (2) in an intermediate plate (3). The cavities are defined by a flat base (4) and lateral walls (5) perpendicular to this. An elastomeric O-ring (18) is held around the lateral walls by notches (5f) at each corner. The O-ring holds the cup in the cavity elastically but allows it to be removed. The intermediate plate is held in the base (B) of the case by a tongue (8) which engages in a corresponding hole (8a) in the front of the base. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/22; B65D 77/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 33/00 (2006.01); A45D 40/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/22 (2013.01); Y10S 206/805 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0685182 A1 19951206; EP 0685182 B1 19980415; AT 164985 T 19980515; AT 200854 T 20010515; DE 69502050 D1 19980520; DE 69502050 T2 19980813; DE 69520823 D1 20010607; DE 69520823 T2 20010809; EP 0744137 A2 19961127; EP 0744137 A3 19980408; EP 0744137 B1 20010502; ES 2116048 T3 19980701; ES 2159334 T3 20011001; FR 2719981 A1 19951124; FR 2719981 B1 19960607; JP H07313246 A 19951205; US 5713471 A 19980203

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: L'*OREAL

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: L'*OREAL

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040428

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040427

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-06-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040617

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040427

2004-04-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040427

2003-05-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030508

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-05-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030502

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030429

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030429

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-04-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030423

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-04-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030411

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-04-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030408

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-04-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030404

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159334 T3

2001-08-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520823 20010607

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-05-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 685182

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200854 T 20010515

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990616

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981008

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-11-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 685182

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE