Global Patent Index - EP 0744143 B1

EP 0744143 B1 2001-01-03 - Armrest for armchairs or chairs

Title (en)

Armrest for armchairs or chairs

Title (de)

Armlehne für Sessel oder Stühle

Title (fr)

Accoudoir pour fauteuils ou chaises

Publication

EP 0744143 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96107670 A

Priority

DE 29508429 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744143A1] The armrest consists of an arm support (3) on the top of, and the same length as, an elongated base (2). The arm support can swivel in relation to the base on a vertical axle (4) at the back of the base. The arm support's swivel movement is restricted by a circle-arc shaped cavity with centre through the vertical axle into which a guide pin (6) protrudes. The cavity is positioned on the arm support's underside and has the guide pin protruding into it beyond the top of the base. A preferably spring loaded clutch (7) fits into one of several holders inside the rim support's path of movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29508429 U1 19960919; AT 198411 T 20010115; DK 0744143 T3 20010514; EP 0744143 A1 19961127; EP 0744143 B1 20010103

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GRAHL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2003-05-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-01-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010629

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-14 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-06-14 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-06-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-05-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-05-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-05-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-05-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-04-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606265 20010208

2001-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK GB LI NL SE

2001-01-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198411 T 20010115

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990705

1997-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970215

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK GB LI NL SE