Global Patent Index - EP 0744148 B1

EP 0744148 B1 2000-05-17 - Cleaning apparatus

Title (en)

Cleaning apparatus

Title (de)

Reinigungsgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de nettoyage

Publication

EP 0744148 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96110973 A

Priority

  • EP 92306845 A
  • GB 9116200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0529805A2] A suction cleaner comprises a dust bag 20 and an air filter 19 supported by a carrier 22 which is removable from a wet pick-up bucket 21 of the cleaner so that the function of the cleaner can be converted from dry pick-up to wet pick-up or washing. The carrier 22 comprises a foot 92 enabling it to be set down on the floor during the wet pick-up and washing function of the cleaner, without the dust bag 20 or filter 19 coming into contact with the floor and without risk of dust spilling from the bag 20. The cleaner further comprises a cleaning fluid dispensing system mounted in the hand-grip of the suction hose for dispensing shampoo cleaning fluid during the washing function of the cleaner. The dispensing system comprising a container divided into two compartments 36, 34 by a rollingwall type of diaphragm 64, the first compartment 36 forming a reservoir for the cleaning fluid and having an outlet 60, and the second compartment 34 having an inlet 58 for water under pressure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 11/40; A47L 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 7/00 (2006.01); A47L 9/12 (2006.01); A47L 9/14 (2006.01); A47L 9/32 (2006.01); A47L 11/30 (2006.01); A47L 11/34 (2006.01); A47L 11/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/1427 (2013.01); A47L 7/0009 (2013.01); A47L 7/0028 (2013.01); A47L 7/0038 (2013.01); A47L 7/0042 (2013.01); A47L 9/0027 (2013.01); A47L 9/122 (2013.01); A47L 9/32 (2013.01); A47L 11/30 (2013.01); A47L 11/34 (2013.01); A47L 11/4008 (2013.01); A47L 11/4075 (2013.01); A47L 11/4083 (2013.01); A47L 11/4088 (2013.01); A47L 11/4097 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0529805 A2 19930303; EP 0529805 A3 19930512; EP 0529805 B1 19970115; DE 69216716 D1 19970227; DE 69216716 T2 19970528; DE 69231070 D1 20000621; DE 69231070 T2 20000914; EP 0744148 A2 19961127; EP 0744148 A3 19970212; EP 0744148 B1 20000517; GB 9116200 D0 19910911

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070727

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070727

2006-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-07-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69231070 20000621

2000-05-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 529805

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

1998-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980807

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970805

1997-05-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-11-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 529805

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB