Global patent index - EP 0744195 B1

EP 0744195 B1 2000-09-06 - Snowboard with supportplate for raising the skibinding

Title (en)

Snowboard with supportplate for raising the skibinding

Title (de)

Snowboard mit Tragplatte zum Erhöhen der Skibindung

Title (fr)

Planche de glisse sur neige comportant une plate-forme de réception et de surélévation des fixations de la chaussure

Publication

EP 0744195 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420163 A

Priority

FR 9506333 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744195A1] The ski has a rigid platform (9) at its central sliding zone. The lateral rigid edges (6,7) of the ski each have two projections (10,11,12,13) which are higher than the upper surface (14) of the ski and the platform is fixed to these. There is a layer of elastic or viscoelastic material between each projection and the base of the platform and they are bonded together. There can be one projection on each side to which the platform is fixed or the platform can be made in one piece with the projections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/07; A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/07 (2006.01); A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/07 (2013.01); A63C 9/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744195 A1 19961127; EP 0744195 B1 20000906; AT 196098 T 20000915; DE 69610147 D1 20001012; DE 69610147 T2 20010510; FR 2734490 A1 19961129; FR 2734490 B1 19970704; US 5915719 A 19990629

INPADOC legal status

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2006-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060510

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060506

2005-04-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050414

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610147

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-12

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2000-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196098

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980616

1998-07-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980616

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970110

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT