Global Patent Index - EP 0744197 B1

EP 0744197 B1 2000-02-09 - Snowboard with device for the mounting of a Skibinding

Title (en)

Snowboard with device for the mounting of a Skibinding

Title (de)

Gleitbrett mit Vorrichtung zur Montage einer Skibindung

Title (fr)

Planche de glisse sur neige comportant un dispositif pour le montage d'une fixation d'une chaussure

Publication

EP 0744197 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420185 A

Priority

FR 9506335 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744197A1] The ski has a sole (8), with lower edges (9) and a reinforcing element, a core (13) and an outer layer (12). The central part of the ski has two feet (15) which are in the core and they are joined to a vertical part (16). This holds an upper element (17) above the upper surface of the ski that forms a raised platform. The feet, vertical part and platform are made in one piece which is H-shaped. The outer ends of the feet rest on the lower edges and the vertical part passes through the upper surface of the ski.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/07; A63C 5/12; A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/07 (2006.01); A63C 5/12 (2006.01); A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/128 (2013.01); A63C 5/07 (2013.01); A63C 5/12 (2013.01); A63C 9/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744197 A1 19961127; EP 0744197 B1 20000209; AT 189613 T 20000215; DE 69606577 D1 20000316; DE 69606577 T2 20001019; FR 2734491 A1 19961129; FR 2734491 B1 19970627; US 5836604 A 19981117

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070521

2006-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060510

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060418

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606577 20000316

2000-03-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SKIS ROSSIGNOL S.A.

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2000-02-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189613 T 20000215

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990608

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970509

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT