Global patent index - EP 0744202 B1

EP 0744202 B1 2000-11-29 - Children's slide

Title (en)

Children's slide

Title (de)

Kinderrutsche

Title (fr)

Toboggan pour enfant

Publication

EP 0744202 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96500052 A

Priority

ES 9501363 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744202A2] An improved structure to mount a children's slide. It consists of two hollow modular parts (2) joined at one side to a third part (1) making up a truncated pyramid shaped structure closed at the top by a third part (10) which forms a raised platform having a non-slip surface, its front side communicating with a slide consisting of sections (19) and (20). Parts (13) are connected to part (10), forming handrails. The invention is applicable to make up demountable structures for children to play. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63G 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63G 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63G 21/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744202 A2 19961127; EP 0744202 A3 19970409; EP 0744202 B1 20001129; DE 69611055 D1 20010104; DE 69611055 T2 20010405; ES 1031146 U 19951201; ES 1031146 Y 19960501

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030429

2002-05-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020508

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020424

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611055

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-04

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990318

2000-03-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CHILDREN'S SLIDE

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990318

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970806

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT