Global patent index - EP 0744257 B1

EP 0744257 B1 2000-09-13 - Chipping machine for chips

Title (en)

Chipping machine for chips

Title (de)

Zerspaner für Hackschnitzel

Title (fr)

Déchiqueteuse pour coupeaux de bois

Publication

EP 0744257 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96106168 A

Priority

DE 19518609 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19518609C1] The cutter has a rotor with axially parallel vanes and a cutting ring with blade packets dividing the circumference. Each blade packet has a support block to support the blade with it's cutting edge axially parallel and toward the rotor. The wearing surfaces (10.1) of the support blocks (10) are smooth and, with the radius, form an angle which is less than 90 degrees in the direction in which the rotor (1) runs off. The wearing surface is formed on a wearing plate (10.2) fixed to the support block. The wearing surface is produced by welding re-surfacing and then grinding to a smooth surface. The wearing surface is produced by vaporising or coating, especially to produce a ceramic or chromium coating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27L 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19518609 C1 19960201; AT 196274 T 20000915; EP 0744257 A2 19961127; EP 0744257 A3 19970611; EP 0744257 B1 20000913

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59605865

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130420

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 196274

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-12-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120510

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605865

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-19

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR SE

2000-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196274

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990325

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990325

1997-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970515

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR SE

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR SE