Global Patent Index - EP 0744258 B1

EP 0744258 B1 2000-03-01 - Pressure beam for frame presses and a frame press

Title (en)

Pressure beam for frame presses and a frame press

Title (de)

Druckbalken für eine Rahmenpresse und Rahmenpresse

Title (fr)

Poutre de pression pour presse à cadre et presse à cadre

Publication

EP 0744258 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96106389 A

Priority

DE 19518866 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19518866C1] The pressure beam (5) has two parallel profiles (11,12), located at a distance to each other. The profiles are rigidly connected via several evenly distributed studs (13), which extend at right angles to the profiles. The studs are offset to the back relative to a support surface of the profiles. The studs have cylindrical sleeve sections. Fastening elements positioned in corresponding bores in the profiles, project through the sleeve sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27M 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27M 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27M 3/0086 (2013.01); B27M 3/0013 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19518866 C1 19960627; AT 189986 T 20000315; EP 0744258 A2 19961127; EP 0744258 A3 19970702; EP 0744258 B1 20000301; PL 314369 A1 19961125

INPADOC legal status


2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-04-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000424

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604515 20000406

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19960424

2000-03-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189986 T 20000315

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990518

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970731

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL

1997-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 960424

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL

1996-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 960424