Global Patent Index - EP 0744291 B1

EP 0744291 B1 2000-07-12 - Charge plate fabrication process

Title (en)

Charge plate fabrication process

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Ladungselektroden

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'électrodes de charge

Publication

EP 0744291 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96303398 A

Priority

US 45123295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744291A2] A charge plate is fabricated for an ink jet printer. Initially, a ceramic charge plate substrate is provided, the substrate having an edge, a top, and a bottom. The ceramic charge plate substrate is then edge printed to define a charging face on the edge of the ceramic charge plate substrate. A conductive path is completed from the charging face to the top of the ceramic charge plate substrate to create a charge plate. Charge drivers are provided on the charge plate top surface. The charge plate is top patterned to allow an electrical connection from the charge drivers to the charge plate. Finally, the top patterned surface is coated with a dielectric material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/085

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16 (2006.01); B41J 2/085 (2006.01); B41J 2/095 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744291 A2 19961127; EP 0744291 A3 19980304; EP 0744291 B1 20000712; CA 2177052 A1 19961127; DE 69609248 D1 20000817; DE 69609248 T2 20010308; JP 3945838 B2 20070718; JP H0999561 A 19970415

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69609248

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110514

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110514

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100401

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-10-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-04-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609248

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990831

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961125

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB