Global Patent Index - EP 0744335 B1

EP 0744335 B1 2000-03-01 - Loading shaft for covering a ship's hatch or similar opening

Title (en)

Loading shaft for covering a ship's hatch or similar opening

Title (de)

Ladeschacht zum Abdecken einer Schiffsluke oder ähnlichen Ladeöffnung

Title (fr)

Cage de chargement pour couvrir l'écoutille d'un bateau ou ouverture similaire

Publication

EP 0744335 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96250112 A

Priority

DE 19519283 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744335A1] The loading shaft (6) can be automatically opened and closed independently of the position of the pallet container (4). its upper shaft opening, with the rain-protected pallet container located in the loading shaft or beneath it, is coverable by a screening shield (18) arranged above the pallet container and the load accommodation device (5b) and supporting on the loading shaft. For opening and closing the loading opening in the lower area of the loading shaft, a roller gate is provided closing the loading opening in its one end position. The closed roller door with the pallet container in the loading shaft is arranged beneath it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 17/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19519283 C1 19961107; AT 190025 T 20000315; EP 0744335 A1 19961127; EP 0744335 B1 20000301; ES 2143139 T3 20000501; PT 744335 E 20000831; US 5662059 A 19970902

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080523

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080523

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080522

2009-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080523

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080522

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080522

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080522

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-02-18 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081124

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080522

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20081124

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070516

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH

- Free text: GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH#FORSTSTRASSE 16#40597 DUESSELDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH#FORSTSTRASSE 16#40597 DUESSELDORF (DE)

2007-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-24 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-15 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-04-26 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-30 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Owner name: VODAFONE AG, DE

- Effective date: 20040713

2005-09-30 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Owner name: VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20040713

2005-09-30 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Owner name: GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20040713

2004-09-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Free text: GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH DE

- Effective date: 20040713

2004-09-30 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Free text: VODAFONE AG DE

- Effective date: 20040713

2004-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH

2004-03-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-02-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: VODAFONE HOLDING GMBH

2003-12-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-11-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-11-30 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-09-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH

- Free text: MANNESMANN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#MANNESMANNUFER 2#40213 DUESSELDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH#FORSTSTRASSE 16#40597 DUESSELDORF (DE)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143139 T3

2000-04-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604516 20000406

2000-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190025 T 20000315

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980925

1997-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961129

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE